judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. BEVERLY WRIGHT

Case Information: 89-CM-0808
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. BEVERLY WRIGHTClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3776-89Filed Date:07/13/1989

Opening Event Date:07/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeBeverly Wright N
Jonathan S. ZuckerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES WRIGHT, BEVERLY
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: #89-807 THRU #89-809 & NOTE - 01 #89-781 THRU #89-785 NOTE - 02 CON 89-781, 782, 783, 784, 785 NOTE - 02 CON 89-807 & 908
07/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/24/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JONATHAN ZUCKER, ESQ. (U.S. APPEAL) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD R
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/89-781,782,783,784,785,807, & 809 AND TO STAY 89-781,782, AND 808. AD PANEL SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO CONS 89-781 THRU 785 & 89-807 THRU 809; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD OPE
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/22/1989ORDER GRTG APLT'S MOTION & DISMISSNG APPEAL FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD