judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALAN A. MONTGOMERY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0769
Short Caption:ALAN A. MONTGOMERY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1008-89Filed Date:08/15/1989

Opening Event Date:08/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/13/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlan A. Montgomery N
Mark L. GoldstoneYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George J. Lane YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MONTGOMERY, ALAN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/06/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOLDSTONEM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - IVEYGL FOR - APPELLEE
08/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/23/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARK L. GOLDSTONE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (411 PGS. -- TANNER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD R
01/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BE
02/13/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (235-PGS/TREMEL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO FL LODGED BRF; CASE TO BE CALENDARED AS BUSINESS PERMITS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD K
06/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/14/1990ARGUED PANELTESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD