judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TARA R. PETERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0795
Short Caption:TARA R. PETERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M489-89Filed Date:07/12/1989

Opening Event Date:07/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/27/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/16/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTara R. Peterson N
William L. Peters YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robin C. Ashton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PETERSON, TARA R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-796 NOTE - 01
07/12/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD DSA
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989ORDER SUA SPONTE,89-795 & 89-796 ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD U
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (13 PGS - FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD RT
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 PGS - LEIDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011490 SCHPRD RT
02/15/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(112 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1990COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT #3 (9 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 011590 SCHPRD RT
10/26/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD R
12/03/1990ORDER APLT BRF SHALL BE FILD W/IN 40 DAYS FRM DATE OF THIS ORDER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD GR
01/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/22/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 02-22-91. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 013191 SCHPRD GR
02/20/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 022291 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (42 PGS. -- FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041591 SCHPRD RT
04/03/1991RECORD COMPLETED
07/02/1991ORDER BA DUE 8/22/91, BE DUE 9/26/91 RBA DUE 10/15/91, JAN CAL. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD K
08/22/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082291 SCHPRD BA
09/27/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/16/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD