judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS P. SOBIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0714
Short Caption:DENNIS P. SOBIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9903-88Filed Date:06/19/1989

Opening Event Date:06/19/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/02/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/06/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/28/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis P. Sobin N
Mark L. GoldstoneYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SOBIN, DENNIS P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/9/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 01 8/28/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/2/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 02 BY 10/21/91; SCHED CASE ON JAN NOTE - 03 1992 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/01/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOLDSTONEM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WEINSHEIMERG FOR - APPELLEE
06/19/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989ORDER APPOINTING MARK L. GOLDSTONE AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (550-PGS/GRAYBILL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 011590 SCHPRD RT
04/20/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/09/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FR LV TO FL BRF; LODGED BRIEF IS FILED. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 090991 SCHPRD CHECK
10/02/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 100291 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/04/1991ORDER SS REMOVED FROM 1/27/92 REG CAL, TO REMAIN ON 1/6/92 REG CAL. MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/06/1992ARGUED PANELSTKGBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL NUNC PRO TUNC FROM 8/18/89 MARK L. GOLDSTONE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR APPT OF MARK L. GOLDSTONE, ESQ. NUNC PRO TUNC 8/18/89. MEH PANELSTKGBE SCDATE 020392 SCHPRD CHECK
05/01/1992AFFIRMED JJ ST KG BE
05/28/1992MANDATE ISSUED