judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES F. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0666
Short Caption:CHARLES F. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9413-88Filed Date:06/07/1989

Opening Event Date:06/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles F. Johnson N
George C. Sponsler YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Barbara Johnson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, CHARLES F. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/30 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SPONSLERG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - JOHNSONBR FOR - APPELLEE
06/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE C. SPONSLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD DSA
09/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD R
09/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(11 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 27, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012490 SCHPRD BE
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD OPA
02/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(159 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD RT
02/23/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/27/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/30/1990ARGUED PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELFEBEST SCDATE 053090 SCHPRD RDEC
07/03/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1990APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REHEAR; PET FOR REHEAR DENIED. MEH PANELFEBEST SCDATE 080390 SCHPRD VS