judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNY R. ELLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0665
Short Caption:JOHNNY R. ELLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13000-88Filed Date:06/07/1989

Opening Event Date:06/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnny R. Ellis N
Donnie E. Wilson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Steven N. Gersten YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ELLIS, JOHNNY R. UNITED STATES
06/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONNIE E. WILSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD DSA
08/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD R
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD U
12/18/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (58 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD RT
01/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 21 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/30/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD V
03/30/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 033090 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD BE
05/04/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990ORDER GRTG APLE'S MOT & DIRG CLK TO FL LODGED BE; FO SCH AS SOON AS CALENDAR PERMITS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCRE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -ST CITE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD