judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC F. HEBRON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0985
Short Caption:ERIC F. HEBRON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F752-87Filed Date:08/21/1987

Opening Event Date:08/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/24/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric F. Hebron N
Michael J. Mccarthy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Margaret A. Flaherty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HEBRON, ERIC F. UNITED STATES
08/21/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. McCARTHY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD R
03/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (427 PGS - SWARINGER) JB PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD RT
02/09/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL TO FILE BA W/IN 20 DAYS OR STATEMENT RE RT FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/9/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD BA
03/24/1989ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD M
06/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # (13 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/26/1989RECORD COMPLETED
08/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 8TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BA
08/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/8/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD X
09/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD BE
11/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/13/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD V
12/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD CHECK
01/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
01/04/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/16/1990MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT W/OUT ARG. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD VS
03/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/24/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1992RECEIVED pro se letter from appellant re court's opinion in this appeal, etc.
04/29/1992LETTER to appellant in response to his letter received on April 27, 1992 (JAC)
10/13/1993RECEIVED pro se letter from appellant requesting documents from the Court file.
01/27/1995LETTER from appellant in re to getting copies of the trial transcripts, attorney's briefs, all the motions that were filed by his attorney and the original police report.
02/10/1995LETTER to appellant in response to his letter of Jan. 27, 1995 re case. (JAC)