judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN E. BATTLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0901
Short Caption:MARVIN E. BATTLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3558-89Filed Date:07/21/1989

Opening Event Date:07/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin E. Battle N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BATTLE, MARVIN E. UNITED STATES
07/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS R. KENNEDY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092389 SCHPRD CHECK
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (119-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD RT
02/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 8, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020690 SCHPRD BA
02/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/8/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD V
03/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15,1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030890 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 20, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD V
05/02/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990AFFIRMED GRANT MO OF APLE FOR SUMM AFFI & JUDGMNT ON APL IS AFFIRMED. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD VS
10/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
11/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD