judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEE BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1059
Short Caption:LEE BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5935-89Filed Date:08/22/1989

Opening Event Date:08/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/07/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/16/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLee Brown N
Barry Y. ShimamuraYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, LEE AKA KENNY BROWNING UNITED STATES
08/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARRY Y. SHIMAMURA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
09/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (222 PGS. -- VAN BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD R
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD BA
12/05/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO DENY APLE TO BE HEARD AND MO FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD BE
01/30/1990ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOT FOR SUMM RV BE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE TO BE CAL ON REC & BA ALONE. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 020990 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/16/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD