judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL BROOKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1019
Short Caption:DARRYL BROOKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5425-89Filed Date:08/18/1989

Opening Event Date:08/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/14/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/03/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarryl Brooks N
Reginald G. Addison YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROOKS, DARRYL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM ROSIER NOTE - 01
08/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090789 SCHPRD DSA
09/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
02/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (144-PGS/JACKSON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 012390 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-9-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BA
05/15/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 5 OR CNSL WILL BE REFERRED TO THE BPR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD K
05/20/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/20/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 052291 SCHPRD BA
05/24/1991RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991ORDER MO OF APLT FOR EX TM FL BRF GR. LODGED BA FILED. BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 060691 SCHPRD U
06/24/1991FiledBriefing Completed
06/24/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071791 SCHPRD BE
12/03/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/03/1991SUBMITTED PANELTEKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTEKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD