Case: 04-96-00616-CR
04-96-00616-CR
07/24/1996
Other Drug Possession
Jesus Cardenas, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/19/1998 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
05/13/1998 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
06/12/1997 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
06/11/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/11/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/16/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/16/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/26/1997 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
02/10/1997 | Show cause hearing held | | |
01/06/1997 | Show cause hearing held | | |
01/06/1997 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/11/1996 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
12/11/1996 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
12/11/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
12/04/1996 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed | | |
11/19/1996 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Disposed | Abeyance | |
11/13/1996 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed | | |
10/30/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
08/26/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
08/26/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
07/24/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/22/1996 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/03/1996 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/11/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jesus Cardenas, Jr. | Criminal - Appellant | Jesus Cardenas, Jr. |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Steven C. Hilbig |
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Susan D. Reed
95-CR-3341
2 Years & $1,000.00 Fine.