judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VONDRAK VS. ESMERALDA COUNTY

Case Information: 38144
Short Caption:VONDRAK VS. ESMERALDA COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Esmeralda Co. - Fifth Judicial District - 4860Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/15/2003 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/15/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 23611.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants Dan & Barbara Peterson.) 01-11469
07/09/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Peter Alpert--check no. 1062.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants Vondrak & Knighten.) 01-11488
07/11/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 29, 2001. To Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 01-11715
07/18/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Request for Transcript filed on 07/11/01. 01-12231
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant's Vondrak & Knighten. 01-12367
07/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jay Earl Smith.
07/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 29, 2001. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 01-12536
07/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellants Dan Peterson and Barbara Peterson. 01-12713
08/01/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jay Earl Smith.
11/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 14, 2001. (received via fax) 01-19942
12/03/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 14, 2001. (filed by Fax on 11/28/01.) 01-20189
12/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-21543
01/28/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-01826
02/05/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellants: 70 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-02383
04/12/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellants David J. Vondrak's and Nancy L. Knighten's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/11/02. Signed by: Peter Alpert. 02-06554
04/12/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. (Appendix to Vondrak's and Knighten's Opening Brief). 02-06555
04/12/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Order to Transmit Documents. 02-06603
04/18/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 29, 2002. 02-06945
05/02/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 04/29/02. Signed by: Kirk R. Harrison. 02-07742
05/08/2002MotionFiled Motion. Appellants Dan Peterson's and Barbara Peterson's Joinder in Motion for Order to Transmit Documents. 02-08077
05/29/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/29/02. 02-09390
06/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, certify and transmit the original Plaintiffs' Exhibits 3, 4, 11, 15, and 16, and Defendant's Exhibits D-1, D-3, D-4, and E-5, that were filed in district court case number 4860. 02-09865
06/20/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellants David J. Vondrak's and Nancy L. Knighten's Reply Brief. Mailed on: 06/18/02. 02-10703
07/01/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. (Appellants Petersons). Brief due: 7/12/02. 02-11280
07/15/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/12/02. 02-12055
11/27/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 15, 2003, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP03-RR/WM/MG)
12/24/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/30/2002BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Supplemental Authorities of Appellants Dan Peterson and Barbara Peterson. 02-22174
01/15/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-RR/WM/MG
02/06/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court to enter judgment in favor of the Vondraks and Petersons." NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-02090
02/24/2003MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's David J. Vonddrak's and Nancy L. Knighten's Bill of Costs. 03-02983
03/06/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: Original Plaintiff's Exhibits 3,4,11 and 16, and Defendant's Exhibits D-1, D-3, D-4, E-5 and nine unmarkes pages this day. Memorandum of Cost and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $219.00. 03-03532
03/06/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/26/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2003 03-03532