judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ZACHARY STARKS; DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, APLT

Case Information: 10-FM-0919
Short Caption:IN RE: ZACHARY STARKS; DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Mental Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MRE13-97Filed Date:07/21/2010

Opening Event Date:07/21/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonNY
AppelleeZachary Starks Y

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/12/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
08/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/31/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 8/12/10
10/19/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to fiing an appeal once a cinal appealable order has been entered... (RDBETE) (kt)
10/19/2010DISMISSED
11/10/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived