judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EDD COWDEN v. JETT COWDEN

Case: A-408
A-408
12/15/1944
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
EDD COWDEN
JETT COWDEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/21/1945Motion for Rehearing
01/17/1945Response to Brief filed
01/13/1945Appellees' Brief filed
12/15/1944Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/05/1945Letter Filed
03/21/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1945Response to Brief filed
01/13/1945Appellees' Brief filed
12/15/1944Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jett CowdenAppellee
Edd CowdenAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information