Case: 09-94-00069-CV
09-94-00069-CV
02/23/1994
Miscellaneous civil
McDade + Company
Friendswood Development Co. and American Bureau of Shipping
No
1st Court of Appeals
02/18/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/05/1996 | MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED | | |
11/05/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/28/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in part; /Reversed & Rendered in part | |
03/18/1996 | Petition for Writ | | |
03/14/1996 | Petition for Writ | Filed in Higher Court | |
03/12/1996 | Petition for Writ | | |
02/21/1996 | Mt for ext of time to file Petition for Writ | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/20/1996 | Mt for ext of time to file Petition for Writ | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/18/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
01/12/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/04/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/21/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/20/1995 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/19/1995 | Mt for ext time to file Mt for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/07/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in part; Reversed and Remanded in part | |
04/26/1995 | Submitted | | |
04/26/1995 | Submission | | |
02/22/1995 | Motion for oral argument disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
02/22/1995 | Motion for oral argument disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
02/21/1995 | Motion for oral argument filed | | |
02/16/1995 | Motion for oral argument filed | | |
02/15/1995 | Response | | |
02/08/1995 | Submission | | |
02/07/1995 | Letter | | |
04/19/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/19/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/06/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
03/30/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/28/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/11/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
02/23/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
02/23/1994 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
02/23/1994 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/05/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
American Bureau Of Shipping | Appellee | John D. White Lisa J. Wheeler Jon L. Johnson |
Friendswood Development Co. | Appellee | Kelly H. Scoffield |
Mcdade & Co. | Appellant | David M. Gunn Thomas R. McDade |
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
92-31976