judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-49)
Case Number:06-49Case Docketed On:03/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBP America Production CompanyRobert Allan Swiech
Nicole Crighton
John L. Bordes Jr.
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Karl D. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter form Board of Equalization indicating that the record is in that office and will be available to counsel from there. Request record from Wendy Soto after briefing complete.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/14/2006Brief - Appellant; filed copy of appellant's certification of compliance with W.R.A.P. 3.05; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/01/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
05/01/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/01/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/04/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated (Nunc Pro Tunc)OrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal