judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOUISE T. HAMAKER V. JOSEPH W. HAMAKER, JR.

Case Information: 10-FM-0934
Short Caption:LOUISE T. HAMAKER V. JOSEPH W. HAMAKER, JR.Classification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1440-07Filed Date:07/26/2010

Opening Event Date:07/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/03/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/24/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLouise T. Hamaker NPro SeN
AppelleeJoseph W. Hamaker, Jr.N
Alan S. Solomon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 8/27/08 6/2/10 (rt. needed)
08/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 26, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
08/31/2010 ORDERED, sua sponte, that this court's August 19, 2010 order is vacated in its entirety. (ETW)
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (65 pgs/tape) 6/2/10 proc.
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (11 pgs/tape) 8/27/08 proc. w/cd
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/10/2010RECORD INDEX
10/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/18/2010APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
11/15/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
11/19/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before December 17, 2010. (JAC)
12/17/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/17/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (Titled: Aplt's response to aple's brief)
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/19/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT (Titled: Aplt's statements to summary I Calendar) Denied
04/27/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter will be submitted for decison on may 3, 2011, on the record and briefs filed without argument by any party. (JC)
05/03/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (295 pgs/tape) 11/2/09 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011SUBMITTED to Washington,Glickman,Pryor.
05/18/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
06/24/2011MANDATE ISSUED