judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SARMIENTO (LUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32075
Short Caption:SARMIENTO (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 1624Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/23/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09826
04/17/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Leave to Proceed in Proper Person.
04/17/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
06/23/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
06/23/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02182
02/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02394
02/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. 01-02394