judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEANGELO K. CLAYBORNE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0950
Short Caption:DEANGELO K. CLAYBORNE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:10-CF-0950Consolidated: 10-CF-1033 , 10-CF-1158
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26170-09Filed Date:07/29/2010

Opening Event Date:07/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/18/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeAngelo K. ClayborneY
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kevin A. Chambers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
09/03/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-950 and 10-CF-1033 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Nathaniel D. Creek in appeal no. 10-CF-1033. F/O that counsel for appellant Nathaniel D. Creek shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sydney Hoffman, Esquire in appeal no. 10-CF-1033
09/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (CLAYBORNE) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
09/28/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEAL no. 10-CF-1158 with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CF-950 and 10-CF-1033 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Edward Gain, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appeallant David Malone Jones in appeal no. 10-CF-1158. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant David Malone Jones shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript avaiable for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/05/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (CREEK) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (56 pgs/Shelton) 5/11/10 proc.
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (244 pgs/Shelton) 5/13/10 proc.
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (67 pgs/tape) 5/14/10 proc.
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (148 pgs/Coney) 5/17/10 proc.
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (19 pgs/Ronan) 5/18/10 proc. w/cd
10/18/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-950)
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-950)
10/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/8/11. (Creek) no oppo
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Jones)
12/08/2010APPENDIX - attached to brief (Jones)
12/10/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days (Clayborne)
12/15/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1033)
12/15/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1033)
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1158)
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1158)
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant Nathaniel D. Creek's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, and appellant Angelo K. Clayborne's motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Creek is granted and appellant Creek's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 8, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Clayborne's motion is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 7, 2010. (Castillo)
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 14, 2011 (Clayborne)(unopposed)
01/12/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appendix in 10-CF-950.
01/14/2011 On consideration of appellant Angelo K. Clayborne's motion for extension of time to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and appendix of appellant Angelo K. Clayborne, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Clayborne is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief and limited appendix of appellant Nathaniel D. Creek remain due on or before February 8, 2011. (Castillo)
01/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF - Angelo K. Clayborne
01/14/2011APPENDIX - Angelo K. Clayborne
02/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Creek)
02/01/2011APPENDIX
03/08/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 15 days. no oppo
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 23, 2011. (JAC)
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/23/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (Jones)
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Glickman, Steadman
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
01/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Jones) (Appellant)
01/06/2012FiledMandate