judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LORRAINE M. KELLER v. RONALD D. KELLER

Case Heading (06-57)
Case Number:06-57Case Docketed On:03/16/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LORRAINE M. KELLER v. RONALD D. KELLER
Full Title:LORRAINE M. KELLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. RONALD D. KELLER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLorraine M. KellerWilliam R. Shelledy Jr.
AppelleeRonald D. KellerJohn W. Davis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 138
Citation:145 P.3d 451

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/12/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/08/2006Notice-Incoming - No designation of record filed by counsel for appellant.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
06/08/2006Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
06/19/2006Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
07/05/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Returned check No. 8192 for payment of sanction to counsel for appellant for signature.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
10/31/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/18/2006Service - Certified mail signature return card. Signed for 11/17/06 by SuZann Whitlock.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal