Case: 02-14-00084-CR
02-14-00084-CR
03/05/2014
Tampering With or Fabricating Physical Evidence
David Lee Morris
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/11/2014 | Mandate issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/10/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/10/2014 | Motion to withdraw appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/09/2014 | Submitted | | |||||
03/19/2014 | Motion to withdraw appeal filed | | |||||
03/07/2014 | Motion to withdraw appeal filed | | |||||
03/05/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/11/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Morris, David Lee | Criminal - Appellant | Richard Alley |
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Everett Young
1356093R
Court Reporter, 297th District Court
10 Years IDTDCJ