judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEXANDER VS. SARVEY

Case Information: 34608
Short Caption:ALEXANDER VS. SARVEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A390496Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07081
08/03/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Edwards firm-check no. 016312.
08/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/10/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 5, 1999. 99-07749
08/24/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
12/14/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-12596
01/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing statement; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-00618
01/28/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-01468
01/28/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01469
05/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 15 days. 00-08840
05/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Affirm Judgment. 00-09173
06/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Affirm Judgment and Motoin for Enlargement of Time to File Appeal Brief. 00-10109
06/22/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (opposition to motion to dismiss appeal). 00-10704
06/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 31, 2000, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal and to affirm the underlying judgment. On June 14, 2000, appellant filed an opposition. No good cause appearing, we deny respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal and to affirm the underlying judgment. We grant appellant's motion to enlarge time to file appellant's opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 10 days from the date of this order. 00-10943
07/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
07/13/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 7/12/00. 00-12057
08/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/8/00 (Airborne Express). 00-13753
08/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-13754
08/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
08/30/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 8/28/00. 00-15247
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southren Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04769
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
08/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "Affirmed". SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. 01-13544
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13576
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2001. 01-13576