judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BEVERLY ANN IBN-TAMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-1278
Short Caption:BEVERLY ANN IBN-TAMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F32435-76Filed Date:12/07/1979

Opening Event Date:12/07/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/18/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/03/1980
Argued/Submitted:09/18/1980
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBeverly Ann Ibn-Tamas N
William E. Mcdaniels NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IBN-TAMAS, BEVERLY ANN UNITED STATES
12/07/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/18/1980FiledRecord Completed
06/03/1980FiledBriefing Completed
09/18/1980FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/17/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition