judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN ACE SAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0057)
Case Number:S-07-0057Case Docketed On:03/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:STEVEN ACE SAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN ACE SAM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven Ace SamTina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Elizabeth C. Gagen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2008 WY 25
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/12/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
05/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/06/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court. Chief Justice Voigt files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Golden joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/17/2008Event - Phone Call. Called the District Court and spoke to Annette. They did receive the original record back and it was on their shelf. We never received the green certified mail card back.EventPhone CallFinal