judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF CHRISTOPHER MAGLARAS

Case Information: 36260
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF CHRISTOPHER MAGLARASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - SCR 111 - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/09/2000Petition/BarFiled Petition. Petition for SCR 111 Review. 00-09825
06/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 5 days.
07/14/2000Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Granting Bar Petition. Pursuant to SCR 111. Bar counsel requests that this court enter an order conclusively establishing Maglaras's conviction of a serious crime warranting temporary suspension and referring this matter to the Southern Nevada Disciplinary Board for formal proceedings at such time as Maglaras may petition for reinstatement. " ...we provisionally grant bar counsel's petition." No petition for reinstatement may be considered until the disciplinary proceedings resulting from Maglaras's 11/8/99 felony convictions are resolved. If the conduct underlying the convictions and the disbarment is the same, no disciplinary proceedings shall be held with respect to the convictions at issue here. fn1[This order constitutes our final disposition of this matter. Any further proceedings should be filed under a new docket number.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12148
07/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
07/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to provide proof of service. 00-12351
07/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 9, 2000, bar counsel for the State Bar of Nevada filed a petition pursuant to SCR 111, based upon the felony conviction of disbarred attorney Christopher Maglaras. That same day, this court issued a notice to bar counsel to provide proof of service of the petition. On July 14, 2000, we conditionally granted the petition . On July 17, 2000, bar counsel filed a motion for an extension of time to serve the petition. In the interest of due process, we conclude that the better practice is to serve the convicted attorney with a copy of the petition. In this particular case, as Maglaras was disbarred at the time the petition was filed, we decline to vacate our July 14, 2000, order conditionally granting the petition. Instead, we grant bar counsel's motion, and direct bar counsel to serve a copy of the order as well as the petition upon Maglaras. Bar counsel shall have until September 15, 2000, to file proof of service of the petition and this court's July 14, 2000, order upon Maglaras. 00-13191
08/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Attempted Service and Request for Directive. 00-13850
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 9, 2000, bar counsel filed a "Notice of Attempted Service and Request for Directive." We direct bar counsel to publish the petition and order in the same manner as a sumons is published pursuant to NRCP 4(e). Bar counsel shall mail copies of the petition and order to maglaras' last known address. Bar counsel shall mail copies to the Department of Prole and probation, with a request that the documents be forwarded to Maglaras. Bar counsel shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file proof of service in compliance with this directive. 00-15803
11/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and by Publication. 00-19206