judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAYLAR EMMA NUEVELLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0949
Short Caption:TAYLAR EMMA NUEVELLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:10-CF-0949Consolidated: 12-CO-1469
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25817-08Filed Date:07/28/2010

Opening Event Date:07/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/04/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/03/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/06/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTaylar Emma NuevelleY
Julian S. GreenspunYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David B. GoodhandNN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
James M. Perez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Stephen Riddell, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Stephen Riddell, Esquire
09/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
01/21/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (42 pgs/tape) 11/24/08 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (74 pgs/Rogers) 10/22/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (128 pgs/Maddox) 10/26/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (149 pgs/Maddox) 10/27/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (40 pgs/Maddox) 10/28/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (21 pgs/Maddox) 10/28/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (15 pgs/Davis) 11/12/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (15 pgs/Maddox) 11/25/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (34 pgs/Davis) 12/21/09 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (181 pgs/Armstrong) 1/21/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (149 pgs/Armstrong) 1/22/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (132 pgs/Armstrong) 1/25/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (150-252 pgs/Armstrong) 1/25/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (253-476 pgs/Armstrong) 1/26/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (477-644 pgs/Armstrong) 1/27/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (645-853 pgs/Armstrong) 1/28/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (854-1009 pgs/Armstrong) 1/29/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (126 pgs/Wood) 2/1/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (14 pgs/Wood) 2/2/10 proc.
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (92 pgs/Jeon) 7/1/10 proc. w/cd
02/01/2011RECORD COPIES
02/01/2011RECORD INDEX
02/01/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (SEALED pleadings)
02/02/2011LETTER - from aplt re: attorney
02/17/2011ORDED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of Stephen W. Riddell, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Stephen W. Riddell, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 60 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
02/17/2011FiledRecord Completed
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
04/25/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. (Castillo)
05/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (additional RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO PERMIT INTERIM PAYMENTS LW
05/23/2011FiledRECEIVED - copy of counsel's exparte memorandum in support of motion to permit interim payments (in yellow envelope) under seal *********SEALED PER 6/2/11 ORDER LW
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT INTERIM VOUCHERS LW ****************SEALED PER 6/2/11 ORDER
06/02/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO SEAL IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the motion for permission to submit interim vouchers under seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to submit interim voucher IS GRANTED and counsel for appellant is permitted to file interim voucher no earlier than every 60 days. Further each request will be reviewed for reasonableness and once approved the court will cause 20% to be withheld from each payment until conclusion of the appeal, submission of the final voucher request and final determination on the reasonabless of the voucher requests. (BY: ETW)LW
07/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 60 days (Appellant)
08/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 9/6/11.
08/30/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Denied
09/14/2011FiledOrder directing the motion for stay held in abeyance for 90 days - appellant advise by 12/15/11 status of motion in trial court.
10/20/2011FiledStatus Report regarding pending - pending resolution of 23-110 motion(Appellant)
12/30/2011FiledStatus Report regarding pending - 23-110 motion filed in the trial court (Appellant)
02/17/2012FiledStatus Report regarding pending (Appellant)
03/06/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)
03/06/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/29/12.
05/29/2012FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/31/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES
06/19/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED BRIEF & APPENDIX and APPELLEE SHALL FILE THE BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS
06/19/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/19/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/19/2012FiledMotion To Stay Appeal pending the resolution of the 23-110 motion (Joint) (Appellee)Held in Abeyance
07/27/2012FiledOrder Motion To Stay Appeal pending the resolution of the 23-110 motion (Joint) (Appellee) and appellant advise on or before 10/22/12, the status of motion in the trial court.
08/21/2012LodgedPro se motion to File Confidential Memorandum Regarding Attorney Client Communication under Seal (Appellant)
08/28/2012FiledLetter to appellant's counsel referring appellant's pro-se motion lodged with this court on 8/21/12.
09/11/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 10-CF-949 and 12-CO-1469
09/11/2012FiledInitial Order in appeal no 12-CO-1469
09/11/2012FiledAppointing Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to 8/31/12 Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire
09/12/2012FiledLetter From attorney Julian S. Greenspan in response to August 8, 2012 letter from the court (Appellant)
09/17/2012LodgedStatement regarding status report (Appellant)
09/17/2012FiledLetter From appellant to Clerk of Court re: letter sent to atttorney Julian Greenspun re: phone calls (Appellant)
09/24/2012FiledLetter From appellant citing issues with counsel (Appellant)
09/26/2012FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (12-co-1469) (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (54 pgs/Gardner) 6/12/12 proc. w/cd
10/04/2012FiledRecord Completed
10/09/2012FiledStatus Report regarding status of Trial Court matter (Appellant)
10/18/2012FiledBriefing Order addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 12-CO-1469
10/19/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-1469)
10/19/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-1469)
10/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and appellant's brief addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 12-CO-1469 due on 1/18/13
11/06/2012FiledLetter From appellant updating on issues with counsel (Appellant)
11/20/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)
11/20/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record and file material under seal in support of motion for leave to withdraw (Appellant)Granted
11/28/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRAW//MOTION TO SUPP REC UNDER SEAL
12/05/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #23 (Order Judge Canan filed 8/9/10; Ex Parte motion for permission to travel Northern Neck Regional Jail in Warsaw, Virginia to meet with client filed 5/31/11)
12/21/2012FiledOrder Granting motion to file under seal and Clerk shall filed the lodged memo under seal. (FIBRNK)
12/21/2012FiledMemorandum of Counsel in Support of Motion for Leave to Withdraw (Appellant)
12/21/2012FiledF/Order Denying motion to withdraw. Appellant shall cooperate with counsel since new counsel will not be appointed.
01/25/2013FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged (Appellant)Granted
01/29/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED EXCESS PAGED BRIEF
02/05/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL the LODGED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF and APPENDIX and APPELLEE'S BRIEF IS DUE W/N 30 DAYS
02/05/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/05/2013FiledAppendix (Volumes 1-4) (Appellant)
03/05/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/12/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/6/13
05/06/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
05/09/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/20/13
05/17/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/28/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/3/13
06/03/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/03/2013FiledBriefing Completed
06/19/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/24/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
06/27/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 7/25/13
07/22/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/06/2013FiledSubmitted to Associate Judge Fisher, Senior Judge Newman, and Senior Judge Nebeker
01/23/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge; and Newman and Nebeker, Senior Judges)
02/14/2014FiledMandate