judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-409
A-409
12/13/1944
MISC PETITION
F. G. WATKINS, ET UX.
SUE ALICE SLAUGHTER, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/20/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/07/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/31/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/24/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1945Letter Filed
07/30/1945Letter Filed
06/20/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/07/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/31/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/24/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
02/14/1945Letter Filed
02/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
12/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1944Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F. G. Watkins, et ux.Petitioner
Allen WrightAmicus Curiae
Sue Alice Slaughter, et virRespondent
Eastham and SimpsonAmicus Curiae
Jas. L. Shepherd, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information