judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OLUNIYI A. BANKOLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0935
Short Caption:OLUNIYI A. BANKOLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:10-CF-0935Consolidated: 10-CO-1313
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-2123-09Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:10/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/29/2015

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOluniyi A. BankoleNPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Dineen A. BakerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
10/20/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
10/20/2010WithdrawnDISMISSED
10/21/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL no oppo
10/21/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
10/21/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Statement Regarding Transcript.
11/01/2010ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. F/O that appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (ETW)
11/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
11/22/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-935 and 10-CO-1313 are consolidated for all purposes herein. (JAC)
12/02/2010RECORD INDEX (both appeals)
12/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in appeal no. 10-CO-1313 on October 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant has not tendered the $100 filing fee, it is ORDERED that appellant is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee or file a fully completed motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/in 20 days from the date of the order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject appeal no. 10-CO-1313 to dismissal w/out further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (Castillo)
12/17/2010FILING FEE
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (502 pgs/Gilliam) 4/19-21/10 proc.
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (503-629 pgs/Gilliam) 4/22-23/10 proc.
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (19 pgs/Walker) 4/26/10 proc.
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (38 pgs/tape) 7/2/10 proc. w/cd
02/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 18, 2011 (no oppo)
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. (JAC)
07/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (60 Days)
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting motion for extension of time to file Appendix, Brief to 9/9/11 (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file brief. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 9/23/11.
09/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the lodged brief
09/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/31/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
03/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.) **AMENDED ON 7/13/12**
04/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Rehearing En Banc (pro-se Appellant)Granted
04/18/2012LodgedMotion For Extension Of Time to File Rehearing En Banc (filed by appellant's former counsel)
04/25/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant) (MOOT SEE 5/25/12 LTR)
04/25/2012FiledMotion to Withdraw Appellants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed 4/18/2012 (Appellant)
04/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 5/14/12.
05/07/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
05/22/2012FiledMotion for bond pending rehearing en banc (Appellant)Denied
05/25/2012FiledLetter to attorney Wood advising him that his motion is moot, due to the fact that appellant's pro se motion was granted.
06/26/2012FiledORDERED that appellant's pro se motion for bond is DENIED.
07/13/2012FiledOrder Granting Petition For Rehearing to the extent that the memorandum opinion and judgment issued on March 23, 2012, affirming appellant's convictions is amended to reflect that a highly detailed description of appellant was provided to officers who responded to the scene.
07/13/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc without prejudice to appellant filing a new petition for rehearing en banc from the amended memorandum opinion and judgment.
07/26/2012FiledMandate *RECALLED (see 4/10/15 ORDER)
05/09/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
06/09/2014FiledChange Of Address Received From OLUNIYI A. BANKOLE (Appellant)
06/26/2014FiledLetter From Pro Se Appellant reguarding the status of pending Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc & Motion For Reconsideration of Bail/Bond On Appeal Pending Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
04/06/2015FiledChange Of Address Received From Oluniyi Bankole (Appellant)
04/10/2015FiledOrdered, sua sponte, that the mandate issued by this court on July 26, 2013, is hereby recalled. F/O that the Clerk shall accept for filing appellant's motion for reconsideration of Bail/Bond and appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
04/10/2015FiledMotion For Reconsideration of Bail/Bond On Appeal Pending Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
04/10/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/21/2015FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to reconsider the denial of the motion for bail is denied.
05/21/2015FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
05/29/2015FiledMandate