judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCKEEHAN (WENDY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38145
Short Caption:MCKEEHAN (WENDY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 27597Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-11539
07/12/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-11842
07/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 11, 2001. 01-11930
08/16/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13945
08/16/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-13947
09/04/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-14869
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17153
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17345
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/14/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2001. 01-17345