Case: 03-92-00260-CR
03-92-00260-CR
06/01/1992
Murder
Steven L. Southall
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1995 | CASE STORED | | |||
02/24/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |||
11/18/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
10/21/1992 | Submitted | | |||
10/21/1992 | Submission | | |||
09/21/1992 | Brief filed | | |||
09/21/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/21/1992 | Submission | | |||
09/09/1992 | Brief filed | | |||
08/11/1992 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
07/23/1992 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/09/1992 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
07/01/1992 | Order Entered | | |||
06/15/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |||
06/01/1992 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
06/01/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/24/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Southall, Steven L. | Appellant | Mr. Troy C. Hurley |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. James T. Russell |
Trial Court Information
264th District Court
Bell
Honorable Jack W Prescott
40,817
45 yrs.