judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

O'LEARY (SHAWN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38146
Short Caption:O'LEARY (SHAWN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP007664Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-11541
07/30/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 4, 2001. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. 01-12851
08/13/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13727
08/13/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-13729
08/20/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-14087
11/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19213
12/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19543
12/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19543