judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-50)
Case Number:06-50Case Docketed On:03/08/2006
Linked To: 06-51
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChevron U.S.A., Inc.William J. Thomson II
Randall B. Reed
Brian Joseph Hanify
Gregory C. Dyekman
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Karl D. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 43
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Board of Equalization indicating that the record is in that office and available to counsel there. Request record from Wendy Soto, along with the District Court clerk when briefing in complete.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/21/2006Motion - Consolidate. Joint motion to consolidate.MotionConsolidateFinal
04/21/2006Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/24/2006Brief - Appellant; and appellant's certification of compliance with Wyo. R. App. P. 3.05.BriefAppellantFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/12/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal. Sent to both Clerk of District Court and Board of Equalization.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/14/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record. Record was received from the District Court clerk 7/10/06 and held until State Board of Equalization delivered agency record pursuant to 3/17/06 letter (see above posting).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2006Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from State Board of Equalization, they did not have agency record, it was sent to district court clerk who sent it with their pleadings.EventPhone CallFinal
07/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/09/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulated (06-51, Whitney Canyon matter)MotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
10/10/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated (06-51, Whitney Canyon matter)OrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance (Gregory C. Dyekman for appellant, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.)Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
10/17/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William J. Thomson, II, Brian J. Hanify and Gregory C. Dyekman, argument by Mr. Dyekman for appellant; Karl D. Anderson, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/14/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/05/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 4/3/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal