judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Marion Brecheisen v. Tessa Dawn Brecheisen, Michael Keith Brecheisen, and Rabo Agrifinance, Inc.

Case: 07-14-00105-CV
07-14-00105-CV
03/19/2014
Divorce
Marion Brecheisen
Tessa Dawn Brecheisen, Michael Keith Brecheisen, and Rabo Agrifinance, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/17/2015Supplemental brief filedAppellant
01/29/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
11/26/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/24/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requestedIntervenor
09/03/2014Corrected brief filedAppellant
08/25/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/29/2016Mandate issued
08/25/2016Order entered
07/15/2016Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
06/21/2016Sent to publisher
06/03/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
04/19/2016Motion for rehearing en banc disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/05/2016Motion for rehearing en banc filed
03/22/2016Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/08/2016Motion for rehearing filed
02/22/2016Memorandum opinion issuedVacated in part and affirmed in part
04/28/2015Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion Granted
04/17/2015Motion to file supplemental brief filed
04/17/2015Supplemental brief filed
04/15/2015Corrected document requested
04/06/2015Submitted
03/27/2015Letter issued by the court
03/11/2015Set for submission on oral argument
01/29/2015Reply brief filed
01/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion Granted
01/09/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
12/17/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion Granted
12/17/2014Submission cancelled
12/12/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
12/12/2014Set for submission on oral argument
12/01/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
11/26/2014Case ready to be set
11/26/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/26/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/24/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/19/2014Appearance of counsel
10/28/2014Sent to publisher
10/10/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
10/08/2014Response filed
10/07/2014Letter issued by the court
10/03/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/26/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
09/26/2014Record checked out
09/25/2014Letter filed
09/25/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/25/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
09/24/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/24/2014Corrected document requested
09/03/2014Corrected brief filed
08/29/2014Letter filed
08/28/2014Order enteredDENIED
08/25/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedStruck
08/07/2014Document filed
08/05/2014Response filed
08/04/2014Record checked out
08/04/2014Letter filed
08/04/2014Letter filed
07/24/2014Reporters record filed
07/22/2014Motion to dismiss filed
07/18/2014Record checked out
07/18/2014Letter filed
07/15/2014Supplemental clerks record filed
07/14/2014Motion to supplement record disposedMotion Granted
07/14/2014Record checked out
07/14/2014Letter filed
07/11/2014Motion to supplement record filed
07/09/2014Letter filed
06/27/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
06/27/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/13/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
06/13/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/21/2014Reporters record filed
05/06/2014Record checked out
05/06/2014Letter filed
04/23/2014Response filed
04/22/2014Supplemental clerks record filed
04/21/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion Granted
04/18/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
04/18/2014Record checked out
04/18/2014Letter filed
04/15/2014Clerks record filed
04/14/2014Notice of late record
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
04/01/2014Reporters record filed
03/20/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/19/2014Docketing statement filed
03/19/2014Fee paid
03/19/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/17/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court
01/20/2014Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
01/07/2014Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law
12/20/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lemon, Shearer, Phillips & Good, PCIntervenorOtis C. Shearer
Claire Walsh
Brecheisen, Michael KeithAppelleeCarry A. Baker
Rabo Agrifinance, Inc.AppelleeW. Heath Hendricks  
Brecheisen, MarionAppellantRichard C. Naylor
Brecheisen, Tessa DawnAppelleeTessa Dawn Brecheisen
Wes Wester
Trial Court Information
84th District Court
Hansford
Honorable William D. Smith
CV04979
Sandra Quillen Boyd