Case: 02-16-00120-CR
02-16-00120-CR
03/22/2016
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Waleed H. Hawidi
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
05/12/2016 | Mandate issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
05/11/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
04/26/2016 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||||
04/22/2016 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
04/14/2016 | Motion to substitute attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/08/2016 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/07/2016 | Motion to substitute attorney filed | | |||||||
04/01/2016 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/01/2016 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
03/22/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/12/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Debra A. Windsor |
Hawidi, Waleed H. | Criminal - Appellant | Taylor Ferguson |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Robb Catalano
1271964D
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3
2 Yrs IDTDCJ