judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTATE OF WEHR VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36251
Short Caption:ESTATE OF WEHR VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392411Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Craig P. Kenny & Associates--check no. 09973.
06/09/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-09774
08/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 30 days to provide a complete copy of the district court's April 27, 2000, order. 00-14858
09/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Addendum to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-16000
09/25/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-16840
10/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We note that although the records have already been released, rendering this petition moot, it appears that the district court may have abused its discretion in releasing the records pursuant to NRS 62.360(2), which governs records in juvenile delinquency proceedings. There is no indication from the documents presented to this court that the petitioner children were involved in juvenile delinquency proceedings.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 00-18318
10/19/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-18579
11/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 16, 2000, this court denied this petition for a writ of mandamus or prohibition. Petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply to the anwer to the petition is denied as moot. 00-19576
11/07/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Craig P. Kenny: returned unfiled, the original proposed Reply to Real-Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus, received October 19, 2000.
11/13/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-18997
11/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.