judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARON ANTOINE GARVIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0937
Short Caption:DARON ANTOINE GARVIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17016-07Filed Date:07/26/2010

Opening Event Date:07/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaron Antoine Garvin YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
08/18/2010TMC - OTSC
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18pgs/Tape) 12/3/07 proc. w/CD included
09/20/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (KRSTSC) (rm)
09/20/2010DISMISSED
09/21/2010RECEIVED - SR #2 -(Supplement to motion to reduce or modify sentence filed 7/7/08 order Judge Cushenberry filed 7/9/08)
09/21/2010RECEIVED - record index
09/21/2010RECEIVED - record copies
10/04/2010StruckAPLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE (EMERGENCY) ANSWER/RESPONSE to court's order of 8/18/10.