judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING,

Case Heading (06-51)
Case Number:06-51Case Docketed On:03/08/2006
Linked To: 06-50
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING,
Full Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChevron U.S.A., Inc.William J. Thomson II
Randall B. Reed
Brian Joseph Hanify
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Karl D. Anderson
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Board of Equalization indicating that the record is in that office and available to counsel there. Request record from Wendy Soto, along with the District Court clerk when briefing in complete.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/21/2006Motion - Consolidate. Joint motion to consolidate.MotionConsolidateFinal
04/21/2006Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/24/2006Brief - Appellant; and appellant's certification of compliance with Wyo. R. App. P. 3.05.BriefAppellantFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/12/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal. Sent to both Clerk of District Court and Board of Equalization.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/14/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record. Record was received from the District Court clerk 7/10/06 and held until State Board of Equalization delivered agency record pursuant to 3/17/06 letter (see above posting).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2006Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from State Board of Equalization, they did not have agency record, it was sent to district court clerk who sent it with their pleadings.EventPhone CallFinal
07/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/09/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulated (06-51, Whitney Canyon matter)MotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
10/10/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated (06-51, Whitney Canyon matter)OrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/10/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal