judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELKANER GREENE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0922
Short Caption:ELKANER GREENE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-8957-07Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/26/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElkaner Greene YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Kristina L. AmentYY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (Titled as: Pro Se Motion Extension of Writ ...) (Served by DCCA)
09/20/2010ORDER GRANTING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL and Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent apepllant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial corut record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: ETW)
09/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond Rigat, Esquire
09/30/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
11/19/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief and appendix
12/20/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 24, 2011
01/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (9pgs/Tape) 6/6/07 proc.
01/19/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/24/2011RECEIVED appellee's brief
01/24/2011APPENDIX - from Appellee and attached to brief
01/25/2011error
01/25/2011error
01/25/2011error (dfe)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COPIES
01/28/2011ORDERED: That the lodged brief of appellant and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this apepal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calender permits. (By: JAC)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
01/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF/appendix
01/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/26/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ruiz, Nebeker
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired,* and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
05/11/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
05/22/2012FiledMandate