judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

T. C. WARREN v. A. J. WHITE

Case: A-402
A-402
12/11/1944
Application for Writ of Error
T. C. WARREN
A. J. WHITE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/05/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/07/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/03/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/02/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/19/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/25/1945Letter Filed
03/13/1945Response to Motion filed
03/05/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/07/1945Supplemental Brief filed
02/03/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/02/1945Response to Petition
01/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/19/1944Brief in Support of Petition
12/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. C. WarrenPetitioner
John W. MillerAmicus Curiae
A. J. WhiteRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information