judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. F. SORRELLS v. C. W. COFFIELD

Case: A-396
A-396
12/05/1944
Application for Writ of Error
W. F. SORRELLS
C. W. COFFIELD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/24/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/23/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/06/1945Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/30/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/23/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/13/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/27/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/12/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
12/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/07/1945Response to Motion filed
05/24/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/06/1945Response to Brief filed
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/30/1945Brief on the Merits
03/16/1945Bond
03/07/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/23/1945Brief in Support of Petition
01/13/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
12/27/1944Brief on the Merits
12/12/1944Response to Petition
12/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
12/05/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. F. SorrellsPetitioner
C. W. CoffieldRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information