judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD E. PINTHER v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND INFORMATION

Case Heading (06-196)
Case Number:06-196Case Docketed On:08/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Administration of the Government (Title 9)
Short Title:RONALD E. PINTHER v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND INFORMATION
Full Title:RONALD E. PINTHER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND INFORMATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald E. Pinther Pro Se
AppelleeAdministration and InformationPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
Elizabeth Bartels Lance

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 56
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/12/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs (certificate of compliance)Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/24/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/08/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of appellee's designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/22/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/26/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volumes I & II, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
04/09/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/25/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal