judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY R. REID V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0946
Short Caption:BOBBY R. REID V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-9052-08Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby R. Reid Y
Sandi S. Rhee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sandi Rhee, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sandi Rhee, Esquire
08/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/27/2010RECEIVED - mot for appeal transcript.
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (28 pgs/Coney) 4/28/10 proc.
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (134 pgs/Price) 4/29/10 proc.
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (303 pgs/Kaczorowski) 5/3-4/10 proc. w/cd
10/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (request for judicial action report---filed 9/11/09)
12/09/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 21, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 9, 2010, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
02/01/2011RECEIVED pro se letter from Appellant regarding lack of communication from court-appointed counsel.
02/03/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Feb. 1 pro se letter from appellant. (JC)
02/04/2011RECEIVED pro se letter from Appellant regarding lack of communication from court-appointed counsel.
02/08/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Feb. 4 pro se letter from appellant. (JC)
02/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/9/11
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 9, 2011. (JAC)
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 17, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before April 1, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/29/11. no oppo
04/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 29, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo).
05/06/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief.
05/06/2011RECEIVED APPENDIX (appellant)
05/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (Castillo)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/13/2011APPENDIX
06/13/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/14/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/28/2011FiledAffirmed
10/24/2011FiledMandate