judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAV ON DRUGS VS. DRAPER

Case Information: 36257
Short Caption:SAV ON DRUGS VS. DRAPERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A408361Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/15/2000 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gugino & Schwartz-check no. 10948.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09815
06/15/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/24/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter.* 00-14892
08/28/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation re: Settlement & Dismissal. 00-15047
09/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-16171
09/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.