Case: 14-17-00337-CV
14-17-00337-CV
05/01/2017
Mandamus
In re Datril Boston
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/01/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
| ||||||
05/01/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/2017 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
05/16/2017 | Motion for rehearing disposed | DENIED |
| ||||||
05/16/2017 | Case stored | | |||||||
05/09/2017 | Motion for rehearing filed |
| |||||||
05/09/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | DENIED |
| ||||||
05/08/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/08/2017 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/05/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
05/01/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||||
05/01/2017 | Record filed |
| |||||||
05/01/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/16/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/16/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Boston, Datril | Relator | Datril Boston |
Bryce Daniel, Inc. d/b/a Fast & Free Real Estate | Real party in interest | Marrick Armstrong |
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 269th District Court
2011-34714