Case: WR-74,461-01
WR-74,461-01
08/13/2010
11.07 HC
PENA, JESSE ELY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/27/2010 | MOT FOR RECON DISP | No action necessary - Does not comply with Rule 79.2 D | |
09/24/2010 | MOT FOR RECON RECD | | |
09/20/2010 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD | | |
09/15/2010 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear | |
08/26/2010 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
08/23/2010 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS | | |
08/13/2010 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/15/2010 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pena, Jesse Ely | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
227th District Court
Bexar
2007CR4265-W1