Case: 14-09-00637-CV
14-09-00637-CV
07/20/2009
Declaratory judgment
Rapid Settlements, Ltd
Settlement Funding, LLC d/b/a Peachtree Settlement Fund
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/13/2010 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
02/19/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
12/17/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/01/2018 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
01/31/2011 | Document returned | | |||||
01/28/2011 | Case stored | | |||||
01/28/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
01/27/2011 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
01/03/2011 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||
01/03/2011 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||
11/18/2010 | Motion for rehearing disposed | OVERRULED | | ||||
10/26/2010 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
10/25/2010 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
09/30/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
09/27/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
09/24/2010 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
09/09/2010 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART |
| ||||
05/04/2010 | Submitted | | |||||
04/20/2010 | Notice filed | | |||||
04/13/2010 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
04/12/2010 | Reply brief due | | |||||
04/02/2010 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/18/2010 | Motion to file reply brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
03/15/2010 | Motion to file reply brief filed | | |||||
02/19/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
02/19/2010 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/19/2010 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
01/21/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
01/18/2010 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
01/13/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/17/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
12/16/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/09/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
11/23/2009 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||
11/19/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
11/18/2009 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
11/17/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
11/17/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/16/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
11/09/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/04/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/02/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/22/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
10/19/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
10/16/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/30/2009 | Clerks record due | | |||||
09/16/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
09/03/2009 | Response due | | |||||
08/31/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
08/28/2009 | Clerks record due | | |||||
08/19/2009 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record | | |||||
08/17/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
08/13/2009 | No clerks record filed in civil case | | |||||
08/12/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
08/10/2009 | Clerks record due | | |||||
08/10/2009 | Record due | | |||||
08/06/2009 | Mediation docketing statement returned | | |||||
08/06/2009 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
08/06/2009 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
07/29/2009 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||
07/29/2009 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
07/22/2009 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
07/22/2009 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
07/22/2009 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
07/22/2009 | Court fee due | | |||||
07/20/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
06/30/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/01/2018 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Settlement Funding LLC d/b/a Peachtree Settlement Funding | Appellee | L. Bradley Hancock Paul Jonathan Brown Jessica Lee Freedson |
Rapid Settlements Ltd | Appellant | John R. Craddock Susan Hatcher Knight Stewart A. Feldman |
Trial Court Information
113th District Court
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA ANN HANCOCK
2006-23366A