judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICHOLAS JAMES LANDOLINA V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-0915
Short Caption:NICHOLAS JAMES LANDOLINA V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF23177-09Filed Date:07/19/2010

Opening Event Date:07/19/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNicholas James Landolina NPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/12/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from an order of a MJ JUDGE w/o first having sought review by a Superior Court Judge. See DC Code 11-1732 (k)(2001). (BY: ETW)
08/12/2010TMC - OTSC
09/20/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. See DC Code 11-1732(k)(2001). (KRSTSC) (rm)
09/20/2010DISMISSED
10/12/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived