judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF FORGY

Case Information: 38131
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF FORGYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G19102Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joel F. Hansen & Associates--check no. 3037.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11370
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/16/2001Other Other. Returned, unfiled, to Joel F. Hansen & Associates, check no. 3074 in the amount of $250.00. (Cost bond is filed in the district court.)
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 10, 2001. 01-11958
07/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-12421
07/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12422
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. We suspend the briefing schedule pending further order of this court. 01-14310
09/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: David C. Polley. 01-15200
09/14/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/16/01, 5/7/01. To Court Reporter: Family Court Transcript Video Services. 01-15580
09/25/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-16160
10/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 16, 2001 and May 7, 2001. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 01-17904
11/09/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Amended Transcript. Proceedings: April 16, 2001. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-18759
11/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Supplemental Response to Show Cause. 01-19383
09/09/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-15553
10/04/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15753
10/04/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/21/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2002. 02-15753