Case: 13-10-00375-CR
13-10-00375-CR
07/20/2010
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
ALFREDO TORRES
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
09/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
09/07/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2013 | Case stored | | |||
01/30/2013 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||
01/25/2013 | Mandate issued | | |||
11/01/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||
06/29/2012 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
06/29/2012 | Letter received | | |||
11/07/2011 | Submitted | | |||
10/17/2011 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
10/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
10/04/2011 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/03/2011 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
09/07/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
09/07/2011 | Motion for leave filed | | |||
09/07/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||
08/11/2011 | Order entered | | |||
08/11/2011 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
08/11/2011 | Case reinstated | | |||
07/20/2011 | Telephone call received | | |||
07/14/2011 | Order issued | Abated | | ||
06/01/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
04/27/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |||
04/07/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/14/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/25/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
01/11/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |||
11/23/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/18/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
10/25/2010 | Notice of late brief | | |||
09/14/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
09/10/2010 | Exhibits filed | | |||
09/10/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
08/19/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | | |||
08/18/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
08/18/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||
07/20/2010 | Trial court certification filed | | |||
07/20/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
06/21/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/25/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TORRES, ALFREDO | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Alfredo Morales Jr. |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Rene A. Guerra Hon. Theodore C. Hake |
Trial Court Information
206th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Rose Guerra Reyna
CR-089-10-D