Case: 12-0088
12-0088
01/30/2012
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
THE CITY OF HOUSTON, TEXAS
CESAR I. URIBE-MENDOZA AND IVONNE AGUILAR-ANGELES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/30/2012 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cesar I. Uribe-Mendoza, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | |
01/30/2012 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
01/30/2012 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | E-FILED Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Houston. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 10 H-3 | | |||
10/29/2013 | Case Stored | Row 22 G-5 | | |||
10/22/2013 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||
08/30/2013 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||
04/30/2012 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cesar I. Uribe-Mendoza, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||||
03/29/2012 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than 4/30/12. | ||||
02/28/2012 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||
02/21/2012 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of Cesar I. Uribe-Mendoza, et al. | ||||
01/30/2012 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |||
01/30/2012 | Petition for Review | E-FILED Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Houston. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 10 H-3 |
10/29/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 22 G-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Uribe-Mendoza, Cesar I. | Respondent | Mr. Sean Michael Palavan Mr. Mehran 'Mike' Talabi |
The City of Houston, Texas | Petitioner | Ms. Judith Lee Ramsey Mr. David M. Feldman Ms. Lynette Fons Mr. Bertrand L. Pourteau II |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-11-00647-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___, 12-22-11
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Per Curiam
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable Randall W. Wilson
2010-40603